This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/12/2019 at 15:52:03 (UTC).

VILLAGE OAKS REALTY II INC VS. ALMA GREENE

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 VILLAGE OAKS REALTY II INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALMA GREENE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

Village Oaks Realty II INC

Defendant

Greene, Alma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J Lowenhaupt

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

03/12/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment by Judge

03/06/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Order on Motion to Strike

03/06/2019 - Order on Motion to Strike

Non-Military Affidavit

03/05/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion to Strike

03/05/2019 - Motion to Strike

Reply to Answer

03/04/2019 - Reply to Answer

Notice of Default Not Entered

03/04/2019 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Non-Military Affidavit

02/27/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Judgment

02/27/2019 - Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default

02/27/2019 - Motion for Default

Answer

02/27/2019 - Answer

Service Returned

02/26/2019 - Service Returned

Complaint

01/28/2019 - Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: SHERIFF W/CK#25841 Parties: Greene Alma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31359:1862; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Greene Alma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSWER FILED Parties: Greene Alma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Greene Alma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3340045AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 201 MIAMI FL 33173-2586 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Greene Alma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Greene Alma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520005AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 201 MIAMI FL 33173-2586 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less