This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/30/2022 at 17:33:13 (UTC).

VILLA BELLINI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. VS MIAMI-DADE COUNTY CLERK OF COURTS ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 VILLA BELLINI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against MIAMI-DADE COUNTY CLERK OF COURTS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villa Bellini Condominium Association, Inc.

Defendants

Miami-Dade County Clerk of Courts

Gomes, Ernesto

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee

Household Finance Corp. of Nevada

Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company

Asset Acceptance Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Alexis

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/02/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/02/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Order of Default

07/27/2022 - Order of Default

Order of Default

07/22/2022 - Order of Default

Service Returned

07/20/2022 - Service Returned

Notice of Hearing-

07/12/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

07/12/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Default

07/06/2022 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default Judgment

06/30/2022 - Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default

06/16/2022 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

06/13/2022 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Notice of Default Not Entered

06/08/2022 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Service Returned

06/07/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/07/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/07/2022 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

06/07/2022 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default

06/07/2022 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

06/03/2022 - Notice of Default Not Entered

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Asset Acceptance Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:15AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gibraltar Private Bank & Trust Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:15AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION OF NEVADA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 20, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 26, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE@AGLAWPA.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110183AMT PAID:$403.50NAME:GONZALEZ, ALEXIS3162 COMMODORE PLZ STE 3EMIAMI FL 33133-5815COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.50TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$403.50RECEIPT DATE:05/03/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less