Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/29/2019 at 07:56:11 (UTC).

VELPEM MEDICAL CENTER CORP VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 VELPEM MEDICAL CENTER CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velpem Medical Center Corp

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Assignee

Roldan, Hugo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

Shannan Holder

Starkey, Shannan H., ESQ

Drawas, Andrea M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

08/22/2019 - Request for Production

Order:

07/24/2019 - Order:

Request for Production

07/19/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

07/12/2019 - Request for Admissions

Motion to Strike

07/03/2019 - Motion to Strike

Request for Production

06/26/2019 - Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

03/27/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion:

03/26/2019 - Motion:

Notice of Appearance

03/08/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion:

11/25/2019 - Motion:

Notice:

11/15/2019 - Notice:

Motion:

11/15/2019 - Motion:

Order on Motion to Strike

11/14/2019 - Order on Motion to Strike

Memorandum of Disposition

11/04/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Response:

10/28/2019 - Response:

Notice:

10/28/2019 - Notice:

Motion for Sanctions

10/12/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Motion:

10/12/2019 - Motion:

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION REGARDING PAYMENT AND INTERROGATORIES REGARDING PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEF MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE (FILED 11-15-19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO VACATE ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 14, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12/10/2019@10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON DFNT'S MTN TO DISMISS COUNTS I,II & III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO VACATE ORDER DATED 11/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL OF...

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540020AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/24/2019 REGISTER#:354

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Hearing Info: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing Info: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Hearing Info: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant