This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/22/2021 at 02:01:52 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS (LLC) VS ALEXANDER SALAS

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEXANDER SALAS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velocity Investments (LLC)

Defendant

Salas, Alexander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walter A Bajak

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

09/21/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Affidavit as to Costs

09/21/2021 - Affidavit as to Costs

Non-Military Affidavit

09/21/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Memorandum of Disposition

08/26/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Certificate of Service

08/19/2021 - Certificate of Service

Service Returned

08/10/2021 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

07/20/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

07/09/2021 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

07/09/2021 - Email Notice:

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/09/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Salas Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2130033AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/21/2021 REGISTER#:213CASHIER:NICCODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Salas Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180080AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JONATHAN R SINGER O&L LAW GROUP P.L. 110 W COLUMBUS DRIVE TAMPA FL 33602 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/10/2021 REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $7020.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: JSINGER@OLLAWGROUP.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bajak, Walter Anthony