This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/11/2022 at 03:09:01 (UTC).

VANESSA BELIZAIRE VS UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 VANESSA BELIZAIRE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

Belizaire, Vanessa

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott, Patrice

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/22/2022 - Complaint

Motion to Withdraw

08/08/2022 - Motion to Withdraw

Memorandum of Disposition

11/03/2022 - Memorandum of Disposition

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2720006AMT PAID:$9.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2120-COPY9$1.00$9.00TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHANGETENDER AMT:($1.00)RECEIPT DATE:10/31/2022REGISTER#:272CASHIER:EVANTZE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Withdraw; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120024AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:SCOTT, PATRICEBLUE LINE LAW FIRM, PLLC 1645 PALM BEACH LAKES BLVWEST PALM BEACH FL 33401COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant