This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/12/2019 at 08:04:12 (UTC).

VALLES & ASSOCIATES REHABILITATION SERVICES INC. VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 VALLES ASSOCIATES REHABILITATION SERVICES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLES & ASSOCIATES REHABILITATION SERVICES INC.

Assignor

Perez, Jhanaly

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brown, Felicia B

Markowitz, Richard J.

 

Court Documents

Order of Recusal

03/11/2019 - Order of Recusal

Memorandum of Disposition

03/11/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion to Strike

03/04/2019 - Motion to Strike

Motion for Attorneys Fees

03/04/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

03/04/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice:

03/04/2019 - Notice:

Notice of Filing:

02/12/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Production

02/11/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/11/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/11/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

02/11/2019 - Email Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

01/15/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/10/2019 - Statement of Claim

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Recusal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VALLES & ASSOCIATES REHABILITATION SERVICES INC.; PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2860028AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$60.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/15/2019 REGISTER#:286CASHIER:ANDELLW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480061AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:BROWN, FELICIA B PO BOX 558427 MIAMI FL 33255-8427 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.