This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/06/2020 at 00:00:25 (UTC).

VALLES & ASSOCIATES REHABILITATION SERVICES INC. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 VALLES ASSOCIATES REHABILITATION SERVICES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLES & ASSOCIATES REHABILITATION SERVICES INC.

Assignor

MUNOZ, ANDRES

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown, Felicia B

Defendant Attorney

Griggs, Marcus B.

 

Court Documents

Order on Motion to Compel

07/10/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

07/05/2019 - Motion to Compel

Letter of Correspondence

05/26/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Response to Request for Admissions

05/26/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

03/18/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

03/18/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Memorandum of Disposition

02/27/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Filing:

02/12/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Email Notice:

02/11/2019 - Email Notice:

Motion for Default

12/26/2019 - Motion for Default

Motion/petit for Enforcement

12/26/2019 - Motion/petit for Enforcement

Notice of Unavailability/absence

12/16/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion for Relief from Judgment

11/12/2019 - Motion for Relief from Judgment

Memorandum of Disposition

10/31/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

AgreedOrder

10/31/2019 - AgreedOrder

Response to Request for Production

10/29/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Motion/petit for Enforcement

09/24/2019 - Motion/petit for Enforcement

Order on Motion to Compel

08/22/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31893:2688; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion/petit for Enforcement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Relief from Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2910026AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$380.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/23/2019 REGISTER#:291CASHIER:MONICA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580053AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:BROWN, FELICIA B PO BOX 558427 MIAMI FL 33255-8427 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less