This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 13:39:34 (UTC).

VALENCIA ANN STEVENS VS CITY OF MIAMI ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 VALENCIA ANN STEVENS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF MIAMI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stevens, Valencia Ann

Defendants

City of Miami

Miami-Dade County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Enfield, Theodore H.

Defendant Attorney

Levin, Sabrina

 

Court Documents

Request for Copies

05/10/2023 - Request for Copies

Notice of Production

05/10/2023 - Notice of Production

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

05/05/2023 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Order Extending Time for

05/03/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

05/03/2023 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Motion for Extension of Time

04/06/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/04/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Request for Production

03/07/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/07/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/24/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Unavailability/absence

01/17/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Appearance

01/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/12/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

01/06/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Affidavit of Service

12/16/2022 - Affidavit of Service

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Miami-Dade County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: City of Miami

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160039AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ENFIELD, THEODORE H.3107 STIRLING RD STE 105FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33180COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/01/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less