This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 06:07:07 (UTC).

US FOODS, INC. VS MIAMI PRIME CATERING & FOOD SERVICES L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 US FOODS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIAMI PRIME CATERING FOOD SERVICES L L C. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Foods, Inc.

Defendant

Miami Prime Catering & Food Services L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Batta, Ravi

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/13/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/13/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/13/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/19/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

03/16/2022 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Miami Prime Catering & Food Services L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970086AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BATTA, RAVI21490 W DIXIE HWYAVENTURA FL 33180-1144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2022REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990156AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BATTA, RAVI21490 W DIXIE HWYAVENTURA FL 33180-1144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/14/2022REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BATTA, RAVI