This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/09/2021 at 02:13:05 (UTC).

U.S. BANK VS JANE WELSH ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 U S BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JANE WELSH. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank

Defendants

Welsh, Jane

Webb, Shorteau Samantha

Leslie Estates Homeowners' Association

WELSH (ESTATE OF), HUGH

WELSH (DECEASED), EDDY

Leslie Estates Homeowners Assn No 1 Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffries, Cassandra

Mclain, Robert A

Defendant Attorney

Iglesias, David D

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service

09/28/2021 - Certificate of Service

Notice:

09/28/2021 - Notice:

Affidavit of Constructive Service

09/17/2021 - Affidavit of Constructive Service

Service Returned

09/16/2021 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

08/23/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

08/23/2021 - Service Returned

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

08/09/2021 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Service Returned

08/09/2021 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/03/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/13/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/13/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

07/13/2021 - Lis Pendens

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

07/13/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Notice:

07/13/2021 - Notice:

Notice:

07/13/2021 - Notice:

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/13/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/13/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/13/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF NOTICE OF ACTION FROM MCCABE, WEISBERG & CONWAY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF ACTION - UNKNOWN HAIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, ETC..- PUB: 11/08/2021 - MAILOUTS: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Constructive Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: RETURN OF SERVICE BY FRANK AYLLON CPS #747 ON TANICI LISLIE SERVED BY SUBSTITUTION ON BEHALF OF MOTHER SHORTEAU SAMANTHA WELSH AT RESIDENCE 9/09/2021 @ 530PM Parties: Welsh Jane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JANE WELSH Parties: Welsh Jane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Welsh Jane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Leslie Estates Homeowners Assn No 1 Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Iglesias David D; Leslie Estates Homeowners Assn No 1 Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32627:796; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF PREVIOUS FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LESLIE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION NO 3 INC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Iglesias, David D