Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/12/2021 at 08:17:59 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS SUFFOLK HOMES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against SUFFOLK HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIDELITY & GUARANTY LIFE MORTGAGE TRUST

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

MORALES, JILMA (P GUARANTOR)

MIRAMAR CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

SUFFOLK HOMES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michele R Beermann

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Document

04/21/2021 - Final Disposition Document

Voluntary Dismissal

04/21/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Return for Unknown Party

04/05/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Certificate of Possession of Note

03/17/2021 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

03/17/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

03/17/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/17/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Lis Pendens

03/18/2021 - Lis Pendens

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600211AMT PAID:$5.00 NAME:MICHELE R BEERMANN 100 W CYPRESS CREEK RD STE 700 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2195 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$5.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/22/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Discharge/release of Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32466:3296; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32466:3166; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Parties: SUFFOLK HOMES LLC; MORALES JILMA (P GUARANTOR); MIRAMAR CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580132AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:MICHELE R BEERMANN 100 W CYPRESS CREEK RD STE 700 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2195 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/24/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600098AMT PAID:$1,911.00 NAME:MICHELE R BEERMANN 100 W CYPRESS CREEK RD STE 700 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2195 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1 $1,906.00 $1,906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$1,911.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/19/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32411:1182; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY & GUARANTY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michele R Beermann