This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/19/2023 at 02:06:55 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS MARY JURADO ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARY JURADO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

JURADO, MARY

PEREZ, ROBERTO L

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

PEREZ, ROBERT L

WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roy A Diaz

 

Court Documents

Lis Pendens

07/12/2022 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

07/11/2022 - Complaint

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

07/11/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/11/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Motion for Substitution of Counsel

11/23/2022 - Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

11/23/2022 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Default Not Entered

09/27/2022 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion for Default

09/23/2022 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

09/23/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice:

09/09/2022 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

09/09/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Voluntary Dismissal

08/26/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

08/26/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Filing:

08/15/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Service Returned

08/10/2022 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

08/08/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

08/08/2022 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

08/08/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s); Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEREZ ROBERTO L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DROPPING DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150148AMT PAID:$911.00NAME:ROY A DIAZDIAZ ANSELMO LINDBERG P.A. 499 NW 70TH AVE SUITE 3FORT LAUDERDALE, FL 33317-7574COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$911.00RECEIPT DATE:07/13/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33284:4119; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less