This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/15/2021 at 11:07:54 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS CHRISTINA DOMINGUEZ

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHRISTINA DOMINGUEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST

Defendant

DOMINGUEZ, CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chin- Duncan, Karissa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010069AMT PAID:$5.00NAME:CHIN- DUNCAN, KARISSA100 W CYPRESS CREEK RDFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2181COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$5.00RECEIPT DATE:07/22/2021REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DOMINGUEZ CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Discharge/release of Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32641:2987; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32641:2620; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DOMINGUEZ CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660594AMT PAID:$40.00NAME:CHIN- DUNCAN, KARISSA100 W CYPRESS CREEK RDFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2181COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$40.00RECEIPT DATE:06/25/2021REGISTER#:266CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660341AMT PAID:$911.00NAME:CHIN- DUNCAN, KARISSA100 W CYPRESS CREEK RDFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2181COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$911.00RECEIPT DATE:06/25/2021REGISTER#:266CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32598:355; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-GS3 is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chin-Duncan, Karissa, ESQ.