This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 18:36:04 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

HURTADO, NURYS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roy A Diaz

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

05/22/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs

05/22/2023 - Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/22/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/28/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s)

04/20/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s)

Default

04/20/2023 - Default

Non-Military Affidavit

04/19/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

04/19/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

04/19/2023 - Motion for Default

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/10/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/10/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/10/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/10/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/08/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

01/31/2023 - Lis Pendens

Appraisal of Real Property

01/30/2023 - Appraisal of Real Property

Complaint

01/30/2023 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/30/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s); Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: HURTADO NURYS; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140110AMT PAID:$1,917.50NAME:ROY A DIAZDIAZ ANSELMO LINDBERG P.A. 499 NW 70TH AVE SUITE 3FORT LAUDERDALE, FL 33317-7574COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,917.50RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33563:4725; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appraisal of Real Property; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less