This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/16/2023 at 11:46:41 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS 2209138 ONTARIO INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 2209138 ONTARIO INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

2209138 ONTARIO INC

AMERICAN AIRLINES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

CASAL, ANA

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

CASAL, JULIE

WINSTON TOWERS 300 ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roy A Diaz

Defendant Attorneys

David C. Bakalar

Chad D Heckman

Jeffrey, Douglas J.

 

Court Documents

Answer

08/10/2023 - Answer

Motion for Default

07/12/2023 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default

07/12/2023 - Motion for Default

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/03/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

06/20/2023 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Compel

07/03/2023 - Motion to Compel

Non-Military Affidavit

07/12/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Default

07/13/2023 - Default

Motion to Compel

07/03/2023 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Appearance

10/09/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Order of Default

09/12/2023 - Order of Default

Notice:

09/11/2023 - Notice:

Witness and Exhibit List

08/16/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Notice of Appearance

08/10/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Hearing-

08/04/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Response to Request for Production

07/28/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice:

07/12/2023 - Notice:

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

07/12/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: David C. Bakalar; 2209138 ONTARIO INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1 N/K/A JANE DOE Parties: BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SERVICE OF AMENDED RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Chad D Heckman; AMERICAN AIRLINES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AMERICAN AIRLINES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 9/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060075AMT PAID:$927.50NAME:ROY A DIAZDIAZ ANSELMO LINDBERG P.A. 499 NW 70TH AVE SUITE 3FORT LAUDERDALE, FL 33317-7574COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$12.50$12.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$927.50RECEIPT DATE:12/21/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33513:1840; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Appraisal of Real Property; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less