This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/07/2021 at 00:02:54 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. VS LAZARO VILLADONGA ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 U S BANK TRUST, N A filed an Other lawsuit against LAZARO VILLADONGA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A.

Defendants

Villadonga, Lazaro

Reyes, Vanessa Diaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lippman, Mark R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/30/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/30/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Order:

11/05/2021 - Order:

Answer

11/01/2021 - Answer

Motion for Default Judgment

10/29/2021 - Motion for Default Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

10/29/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

10/29/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

10/29/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Service Return for Unknown Party

10/29/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

10/29/2021 - Service Returned

Certificate of Mailing

10/28/2021 - Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

10/28/2021 - Certificate of Mailing

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/14/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/30/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/30/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/30/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND DEFAULT PARTIAL JUDGMENT IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR EMERGENCY HEARING AND EVIDENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Villadonga Lazaro; Reyes Vanessa Diaz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN PERSON(S) IN POSSESSION - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Reyes Vanessa Diaz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Villadonga Lazaro

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Villadonga Lazaro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Reyes Vanessa Diaz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970233AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:LIPPMAN, MARK R. 4767 NEW BROAD ST ORLANDO FL 32814-6405 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/01/2021 REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIPPMAN MARK R