This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/03/2022 at 10:45:44 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, VS TERRY ANGELA DALBERRY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TERRY ANGELA DALBERRY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,

Defendants

DALBERRY, TERRY ANGELA

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (HUD)

DALBERRY, KIRK PAUL

Dalberry, Kirk P

Dalberry, Terry A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Michael Dilts

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/22/2022 - Complaint

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

07/22/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Lis Pendens

07/25/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/27/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/27/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/27/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/27/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/27/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/27/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/03/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/03/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/03/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/03/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/03/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/03/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: DALBERRY KIRK PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12. Parties: DALBERRY KIRK PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: DALBERRY KIRK PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (HUD)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990134AMT PAID:$918.50NAME:DAVID MICHAEL DILTSALBERTELLI LAW PO BOX 23028TAMPA FL 33623-2028COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$7.50$7.503142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$918.50RECEIPT DATE:07/26/2022REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33306:1953; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Michael Dilts