This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/25/2022 at 22:03:46 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS LUIS A CONCEPCION ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against LUIS A CONCEPCION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank National Association

Defendants

Concepcion, Luis A

Florida Housing Finance Corporation

Odalys Concepcion

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Corey Lewis

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/10/2022 - Complaint

Notice:

06/10/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

06/10/2022 - Notice:

Notice of Related Cases

06/10/2022 - Notice of Related Cases

Lis Pendens

06/13/2022 - Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

06/13/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/28/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/28/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/28/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/28/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: Concepcion Luis A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12. Parties: Odalys Concepcion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: Florida Housing Finance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040028AMT PAID:$40.00NAME:COREY LEWISROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$40.00RECEIPT DATE:07/06/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070233AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:COREY LEWISROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:06/14/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33241:643; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS , COREY