This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/26/2022 at 05:44:34 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ANNETTE M AGUILERA, P.A. ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against ANNETTE M AGUILERA, P A. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST

Defendants

AGUILERA, P.A., ANNETTE M

CARBALLO, DARIEL

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

DE SOTO, JORGE HUMBERTO

KEYS GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

TOWNGATE CONDOMINIUM FOUR ASSOCIATION INC

COUNTRYWIDE BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roy A Diaz

Defendant Attorney

Maryvel De Castro Valdes

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

10/21/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

10/21/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

10/21/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

09/30/2022 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

09/26/2022 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Appearance

09/15/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Response:

09/15/2022 - Response:

Certificate of Mailing

09/14/2022 - Certificate of Mailing

Order Setting CM Deadline

09/13/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

04/04/2022 - Lis Pendens

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

04/01/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Complaint

04/01/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Denying Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN RESPONSE TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Mailing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (STREAMLINED PATHWAY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090220AMT PAID:$927.50NAME:ROY A DIAZDIAZ ANSELMO LINDBERG P.A. 499 NW 70TH AVE SUITE 3FORT LAUDERDALE, FL 33317-7574COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$12.50$12.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$927.50RECEIPT DATE:04/05/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33115:183; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RCF 2 ACQUISITION TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Keys Gate Community Association Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant