This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 03:50:54 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ALEJANDRO BENITEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against ALEJANDRO BENITEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association

Assignor

OLYMPIAN GARDENS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

Benitez, Alejandro

Valencia, Marta G

OLYMPIAN GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Ford Motor Credit Company

Miami Dade County

Community Association Asset Recovery LLC AS ASSIGN

HARVEY RUVIN AS CLERK OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY CLERK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stevens, Adam Jeffrey

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/05/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/05/2022 - Complaint

Proof of Publication

09/07/2022 - Proof of Publication

Order of Default

08/31/2022 - Order of Default

Motion for Default

08/31/2022 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

08/11/2022 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion for Default

08/11/2022 - Motion for Default

Notice of Action - Publication

08/10/2022 - Notice of Action - Publication

Affidavit of Diligent Search

08/04/2022 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Default

08/04/2022 - Default

Service Returned

08/03/2022 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

08/03/2022 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

08/03/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/03/2022 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

08/03/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

08/03/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

08/03/2022 - Service Returned

Answer to Amended Complaint

08/02/2022 - Answer to Amended Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: OLYMPIAN GARDENS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: 0 MAIL OUT Parties: OLYMPIAN GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ford Motor Credit Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Benitez Alejandro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060212AMT PAID:$406.00NAME:STEVENS, ADAM JEFFREY4575 VIA ROYALE STE 200FORT MYERS FL 33919-1018COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$406.00RECEIPT DATE:07/07/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLYMPIAN GARDENS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stevens, Adam Jeffrey