This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/05/2020 at 08:57:09 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR VS JOAN ZARET ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOAN ZARET. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank National Association As Successor

Defendants

Zaret, Joan A

Hampshire Homes Homeowners Association Inc

Zaret, Joan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ullman, Zachary Y, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Iglesias, David D

 

Court Documents

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/10/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Returned

12/06/2019 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

11/15/2019 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

11/15/2019 - Complaint

Email Notice:

11/15/2019 - Email Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

11/15/2019 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover

11/15/2019 - Civil Cover

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Iglesias David D; Hampshire Homes Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2100160AMT PAID:$50.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE5$10.00$50.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/20/2019 REGISTER#:210CASHIER:ANDYM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Zaret Joan; Hampshire Homes Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600172AMT PAID:$911.00 NAME:ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y, ESQ 6409 CONGRESS AVE BOCA RATON FL 33487 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31701:2932; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ullman, Zachary Y.