This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/05/2020 at 14:34:28 (UTC).

US BANK NA SUCESSOR TRUSTEE TO BANK OF AMERICA NA VS KARIM SHARIFI ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 US BANK NA SUCESSOR TRUSTEE TO BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KARIM SHARIFI. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NA SUCESSOR TRUSTEE TO BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendants

BAYVIEW PALMS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

SHARIFI, KARIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zion, Fran Elise

Defendant Attorney

Hernandez, Alexis

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

07/01/2020 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Affidavit of Indebtedness

06/01/2020 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

03/09/2020 - Affidavit as to Attorney Fees

Notice of Filing:

03/09/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Summary Judgment

03/06/2020 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Order of Default

02/27/2020 - Order of Default

Non-Military Affidavit

02/25/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

02/25/2020 - Motion for Default

Proof of Publication

01/15/2020 - Proof of Publication

Affidavit of Constructive Service

12/30/2019 - Affidavit of Constructive Service

Notice of Action - Publication

12/30/2019 - Notice of Action - Publication

Affidavit of Constructive Service

12/23/2019 - Affidavit of Constructive Service

Service Returned

12/18/2019 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/18/2019 - Service Returned

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

12/23/2019 - Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

Lis Pendens

11/18/2019 - Lis Pendens

Non-Military Affidavit

11/18/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Filing:

11/18/2019 - Notice of Filing:

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Filing Affidavits Of Amounts Due & Owing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON JULY 1 5 , 2020 AT 2;30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 1, 2020 @2:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Attorney Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ITS AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SHARIFI KARIM; BAYVIEW PALMS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC; PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600356AMT PAID:$913.50 NAME:ZION, FRAN ELISE HELLER & ZION, LLP 1428 BRICKELL AVENUE SUITE 700 MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31702:316; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Directions to The Clerk; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION PURSUANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.