This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/01/2020 at 21:50:52 (UTC).

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC.

Assignor

MURCIA, HAROLD

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown, Felicia B

Defendant Attorney

Griggs, Marcus B.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Strike

05/29/2020 - Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike

05/28/2020 - Motion to Strike

Notice of Appearance

05/27/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

05/27/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

05/27/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

05/27/2020 - Request for Production

Answer

05/27/2020 - Answer

Pre Trial Summons

05/13/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Taking Deposition

04/08/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Email Notice:

04/08/2020 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

04/08/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/08/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/08/2020 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

04/07/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/07/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2430028AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:BROWN, FELICIA B PO BOX 558427 MIAMI FL 33255-8427 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIPT DAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.