This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/08/2023 at 06:45:58 (UTC).

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC. VS GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC.

Defendant

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Assignee

ROSA, RALPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown, Felicia B

Defendant Attorney

Marissa Hanan

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

03/17/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

03/14/2023 - Order of Dismissal

Letter of Correspondence

02/22/2023 - Letter of Correspondence

Witness and Exhibit List

02/22/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Notice of Interrogatory

02/22/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Supplemental Request to Produce

02/22/2023 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

02/22/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/22/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/22/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/22/2023 - Request for Admissions

Letter of Correspondence

02/22/2023 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Appearance

02/22/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

02/20/2023 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/31/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/30/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Statement of Claim

01/26/2023 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33637:3489; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33621:3370; Event Type: Event; Comments: STIPULATION Parties: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170005AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BROWN, FELICIA BBROWN LEGAL GROUP, P.A. PO BOX 558427 MIAMI, FLORICOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110219AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:BROWN, FELICIA BBROWN LEGAL GROUP, P.A. PO BOX 558427 MIAMI, FLORICOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:01/31/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less