*************P-26
01/26/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Miami-Dade, Florida
UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC.
GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
ROSA, RALPH
Brown, Felicia B
Marissa Hanan
03/17/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal
03/14/2023 - Order of Dismissal
02/22/2023 - Letter of Correspondence
02/22/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List
02/22/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory
02/22/2023 - Supplemental Request to Produce
02/22/2023 - Request for Admissions
02/22/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory
02/22/2023 - Request for Production
02/22/2023 - Request for Admissions
02/22/2023 - Letter of Correspondence
02/22/2023 - Notice of Appearance
02/20/2023 - Notice of Appearance
02/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued
01/31/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements
01/30/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
01/26/2023 - Statement of Claim
01/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33637:3489; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33621:3370; Event Type: Event; Comments: STIPULATION Parties: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170005AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BROWN, FELICIA BBROWN LEGAL GROUP, P.A. PO BOX 558427 MIAMI, FLORICOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110219AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:BROWN, FELICIA BBROWN LEGAL GROUP, P.A. PO BOX 558427 MIAMI, FLORICOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:01/31/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less