This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/26/2023 at 00:22:18 (UTC).

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC VS DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unlimited Diagnostic Center, Inc

Assignor

Barbosa, Frank

Defendant

Direct General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

Defendant Attorney

Dichek, Jarred S., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice:

05/09/2023 - Notice:

Request for Production

05/09/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/09/2023 - Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

04/24/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Extension of Time

04/14/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Demand for Jury Trial

03/13/2023 - Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Extension of Time

03/13/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Compliance

03/13/2023 - Notice of Compliance

Notice of Appearance

03/13/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

02/21/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/30/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/24/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Appearance

01/20/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

01/20/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/20/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/20/2023 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

01/20/2023 - Statement of Claim

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170015AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050578AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/24/2023REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less