This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/01/2023 at 01:34:52 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS ELIAS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against ELIAS SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SANCHEZ, ELIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodriguez, Diana E.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/24/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

01/24/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/24/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Pre Trial Summons

02/13/2023 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice:

03/23/2023 - Notice:

Order of Dismissal

03/27/2023 - Order of Dismissal

Memorandum of Disposition

03/29/2023 - Memorandum of Disposition

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33640:3595; Event Type: Event; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT Parties: SANCHEZ ELIAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060001AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2023REGISTER#:206CASHIER:BEPEREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SANCHEZ ELIAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130069AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:RODRIGUEZ, DIANA E.9720 STIRLING RD STE 204CCOOPER CITY FL 33024COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/27/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less