This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/21/2021 at 19:20:07 (UTC).

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS SOUTH FLORIDA DIAGNOSTICS GROUP, LLC, A/A/O MICHAEL ATKINS

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against SOUTH FLORIDA DIAGNOSTICS GROUP, LLC, A/A/O MICHAEL ATKINS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

United Automobile Insurance Company

Appellee

South Florida Diagnostics Group, LLC, a/a/o Michael Atkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Williams, Sherria

Appellee Attorneys

Douglas Howard Stein

Lane, Cullen J., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion for Attorneys Fees

12/16/2020 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Request for Oral Argument

09/18/2020 - Request for Oral Argument

Appeal Index

11/25/2020 - Appeal Index

Order:

09/22/2020 - Order:

Order:

12/01/2020 - Order:

Text

03/13/2020 - Text

Notice of Appearance

02/25/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing:

10/16/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Appeal Invoice

05/20/2020 - Appeal Invoice

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Transfer Form; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event; Comments: (APPELLEE'S AMENDED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appellee's Answer Brief; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 20-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Index; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company; South Florida Diagnostics Group LLC a/a/o Michael Atkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Record on Appeal. Volume "Volume"; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Record Due; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplement Completed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: STATEMENT OF COSTS CHECK #1492 CK. AMT.$11.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Invoice; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cross Appeal; Book/Page: 31839:3254; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record Assigned To; Event Type: Event; Comments: TANYA BENNETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Estimated Cost Received; Event Type: Event; Comments: $285.00 FILING FEE AND $100.00 DEPOSIT FOR PREPARATION OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Directions to The Clerk; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appeal filed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less