This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/19/2021 at 13:51:25 (UTC).

UNION REXAM, LLC VS RUBEN D BALDA, JR.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 UNION REXAM, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUBEN D BALDA, JR. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARNETT BANK, N.A.

UNION REXAM, LLC

Assignors

BANK OF AMERICA NA

UNION FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Defendant

BALDA, RUBEN D, Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcadis, Ralph S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/09/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

10/09/2020 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Complaint

10/09/2020 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

10/13/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/15/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

01/21/2021 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

03/18/2021 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

03/22/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Non-Military Affidavit

03/18/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

04/14/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

04/14/2021 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

04/15/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Service Returned

04/23/2021 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

05/07/2021 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

05/07/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Default

05/11/2021 - Default

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BALDA RUBEN D Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BALDA RUBEN D Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BALDA RUBEN D Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BALDA RUBEN D Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BALDA RUBEN D Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2750168AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2020REGISTER#:275CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670040AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:10/14/2020REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNION FINANCIAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BARNETT BANK, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S