This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/06/2020 at 15:22:18 (UTC).

UNIFUND C C R (LLC) VS MICHAEL M POLITI

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 UNIFUND C C R LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL M POLITI. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund C C R (LLC)

Defendant

Politi, Michael M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan R Singer

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

02/24/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Summons Returned - No Service

02/13/2020 - Summons Returned - No Service

Pre Trial Summons

01/22/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Order:

01/13/2020 - Order:

Motion for Extension of Time

01/04/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Memorandum of Disposition

12/09/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Summons Returned - No Service

11/29/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Pre Trial Summons

10/22/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

09/18/2019 - Email Notice:

Statement of Claim

09/18/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190092AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/23/2020 REGISTER#:319CASHIER:ROJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Politi Michael M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150024AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/22/2019 REGISTER#:315CASHIER:DENISE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Politi Michael M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520063AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:JONATHAN R SINGER 4818 W GANDY BLVD TAMPA FL 33611-3003 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: JSINGER@OLLAWGROUP.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1208.66

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.