This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/20/2020 at 16:01:04 (UTC).

UNIFUND C C R (LLC) VS CARLOS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 UNIFUND C C R LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARLOS GARCIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund C C R (LLC)

Defendant

Garcia, Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan R Singer

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process

01/07/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Default Final Judgment

12/23/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Notice of Filing:

12/19/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Non-Military Affidavit

12/19/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit as to Costs

12/19/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Memorandum of Disposition

12/09/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Service Returned

10/31/2019 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

10/22/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

09/18/2019 - Email Notice:

Statement of Claim

09/18/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2080050AMT PAID:$4.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2121-CERTIFIED1$2.00$2.00 2120-COPY2$1.00$2.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$4.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2020 REGISTER#:208

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31749:4548; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Garcia Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150025AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/22/2019 REGISTER#:315CASHIER:DENISE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Garcia Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520069AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:JONATHAN R SINGER 4818 W GANDY BLVD TAMPA FL 33611-3003 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: JSINGER@OLLAWGROUP.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1373.18

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.