This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/05/2020 at 07:47:45 (UTC).

TYRONE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 TYRONE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYRONE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC

Assignor

Antonucci, Dana

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rock, Gregory

White, T Roger, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

La Montagne, Rachel

Sargent, Ivane

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

05/24/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request:

05/13/2019 - Request:

Request for Production

05/13/2019 - Request for Production

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

04/18/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Notice of Appearance

04/18/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/18/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Pre Trial Summons

03/11/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

03/04/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Statement of Claim

01/24/2019 - Statement of Claim

Motion for Extension of Time

12/19/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Compel

12/19/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

12/13/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

10/18/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

10/18/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Reply to Answer

10/04/2019 - Reply to Answer

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/03/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

AgreedOrder

09/16/2019 - AgreedOrder

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

09/10/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2260015AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530024AMT PAID:$80.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/25/2019 REGISTER#:353CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less