This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/18/2020 at 04:45:03 (UTC).

TRUJILLO CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 TRUJILLO CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trujillo Chiropractic Center Inc

Assignor

Sandoval, Tomas

Defendant

Progressive Select Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sagiv, Daniel

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

01/02/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Memorandum of Disposition

12/30/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Service Returned

12/10/2019 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

11/21/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

11/18/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31771:3168; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960012AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/21/2019 REGISTER#:296CASHIER:TWYLAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3690055AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:SAGIV, DANIEL 980 NORTH FEDERAL HIGHWAYSUITE 110 BOCA RATON FL 33432 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.