This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/11/2023 at 03:23:15 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK VS MOSHE AKNIN

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 TRUIST BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MOSHE AKNIN. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Truist Bank

Suntrust Bank

Defendant

Aknin, Moshe

North Miami Beach, FL 33160

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcadis, Ralph S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/06/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/06/2023 - Complaint

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/09/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/31/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Aknin Moshe

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110022AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150315AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/07/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $11457.39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less