This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 04:58:20 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK VS JOSE MONTERO

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 TRUIST BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE MONTERO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Truist Bank

Defendants

Montero, Jose

Antonio Montero, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcadis, Ralph S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

05/19/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/31/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/07/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

06/10/2022 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

06/27/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

06/27/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Email Notice:

06/27/2022 - Email Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: COURTMAIL@LAWPEREZ.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Montero Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040172AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070097AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/21/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S