This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/10/2023 at 12:09:14 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK VS ALEXANDER JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 TRUIST BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEXANDER JOHNSON. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUIST BANK

SUNTRUST BANK

Assignor

LIGHTSTREAM

Defendant

JOHNSON, ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcadis, Ralph S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/07/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/07/2023 - Complaint

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/13/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/13/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/23/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/21/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: JOHNSON ALEXANDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110384AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/29/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: JOHNSON ALEXANDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2040077AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/21/2023REGISTER#:204CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060417AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:02/11/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $13230.95

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less