This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 16:57:50 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR VS ANISH DHADWAL

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANISH DHADWAL. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUIST BANK successor

SUNTRUST BANK

Defendants

DHADWAL, ANISH

Miami, FL 33134-4552

SINGH DHADWAL, ANISH HARBANS

Miami, FL 33155-6340

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcadis, Ralph S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/06/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/06/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/16/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

02/23/2023 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150125AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: DHADWAL ANISH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160115AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:MARCADIS, RALPH S5104 S WEST SHORE BLVDTAMPA FL 33611-5650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/10/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less