This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/08/2020 at 20:43:30 (UTC).

TROY SUTTER VS MIAMI YACHT CLUB INC

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 TROY SUTTER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MIAMI YACHT CLUB INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sutter, Troy

Defendant

Miami Yacht Club Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad E Levy

Defendant Attorney

Beutler, Mark J

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/13/2020 - Complaint

Service Returned

01/22/2020 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/06/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Miami Yacht Club Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Miami Yacht Club Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2280029AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/17/2020 REGISTER#:228CASHIER:MARIAGU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530143AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:CHAD E LEVY 915 MIDDLE RIVER DR STE 518 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33304-3561 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beutler, Mark J.