This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/29/2022 at 18:34:27 (UTC).

TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION VS RACHELLE A PERICLES

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RACHELLE A PERICLES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tropical Financial Credit Union

Defendant

Pericles, Rachelle A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kligler, Joshua C, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

03/04/2022 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

03/31/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Pre Trial Summons

04/11/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Filing:

04/13/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Memorandum of Disposition

04/26/2022 - Memorandum of Disposition

Settlement Agreement

04/26/2022 - Settlement Agreement

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROOF OF SERVICE VIA CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2070023AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/12/2022REGISTER#:207CASHIER:SFLOWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pericles Rachelle A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2040006AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/01/2022REGISTER#:204CASHIER:JFONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pericles Rachelle A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070318AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:KLIGLER, JOSHUA C, ESQ66 WEST FLAGLER STREET SUITE #400MIAMI FL 33130COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:03/08/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIGLER , JOSHUA C