This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/30/2022 at 04:25:51 (UTC).

TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION VS MICHEAL S LARA

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHEAL S LARA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tropical Financial Credit Union

Defendant

Lara, Micheal S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kligler, Joshua C, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/04/2022 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

04/14/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

05/12/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Memorandum of Disposition

05/19/2022 - Memorandum of Disposition

SP Pretrial New Date

06/02/2022 - SP Pretrial New Date

Service Returned

06/20/2022 - Service Returned

Stipulation for Dismissal

07/06/2022 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

07/06/2022 - Order of Dismissal

Memorandum of Disposition

07/13/2022 - Memorandum of Disposition

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33278:4859; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND APPROVING STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT Parties: Lara Micheal S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: AND STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060020AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2022REGISTER#:206CASHIER:JFONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial New Date; Event Type: Event; Comments: DATE 07/11/2022 AT 1:30PM CTRM 6-4 Parties: Kligler Joshua C ESQ; Lara Micheal S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2050017AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/15/2022REGISTER#:205CASHIER:BEPEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lara Micheal S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100107AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:KLIGLER, JOSHUA C, ESQ66 WEST FLAGLER STREET SUITE #400MIAMI FL 33130COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:04/06/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIGLER , JOSHUA C