This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/13/2020 at 12:49:44 (UTC).

TRINGALI, JOSEPH VS EALEY, KEVIN

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 TRINGALI, JOSEPH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EALEY, KEVIN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tringali, Joseph

Respondent

Ealey, Kevin

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

03/09/2020 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 21-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31846:213; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: UNCONTESTED FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 03/09/2020 @ 0930

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3-9-20 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Marital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Tringali Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF CONSENT TO SUBMIT UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ealey Kevin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2680005AMT PAID:$409.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:TENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2020 REGISTER#:268CASHIER:RAMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.