This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/13/2019 at 20:58:49 (UTC).

TRI-COUNTY SPINE INJURY CENTER, INC. VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 TRI-COUNTY SPINE INJURY CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tri-County Spine Injury Center, Inc.

Assignor

Keny F. Fenelon

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul K Schrier

Defendant Attorney

Burgos, Karla

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

04/08/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/08/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/08/2019 - Request for Admissions

Answer

04/08/2019 - Answer

Notice of Appearance

04/08/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/26/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

03/25/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

SP Pretrial Date

03/13/2019 - SP Pretrial Date

Request for Production

01/29/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/29/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/29/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

01/29/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2200012AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/13/2019 REGISTER#:220CASHIER:MARLNEG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530008AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:PAUL K SCHRIER 11098 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 208 MIAMI FL 33161-7486 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less