This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/12/2021 at 12:13:11 (UTC).

TRASCO WELLNESS LLC VS METROPOLITAN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 TRASCO WELLNESS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against METROPOLITAN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trasco Wellness LLC

Tampa Bay Spine and Injury

Assignor

Robert Tolliver

Defendant

Metropolitan General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Statement of Claim

09/21/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/21/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Metropolitan General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080169AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JOHN C DALY 1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200 PLANTATION FL 33322 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/30/2021 REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050078AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:JOHN C DALY 8551 W SUNRISE BLVD SUITE 304 PLANTATION FL 33322 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/22/2021 REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAMPA BAY SPINE & INJURY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Trasco Wellness, Llc., D/B/A Tampa Bay Spine & Injury A/A/O Alice Cornell is a litigant

Latest cases where METROPOLITAN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.