Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/03/2021 at 06:08:45 (UTC).

TRANELL MOBLEY VS WILLIAM DWAYNE ROLLE ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 TRANELL MOBLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILLIAM DWAYNE ROLLE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mobley, Tranell

Defendants

Rolle, William Dwayne

U.S. Security Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/18/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/18/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/14/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/14/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Interrogatory

06/11/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/11/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

06/11/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/11/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

06/11/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

06/11/2021 - Request for Admissions

Complaint

06/11/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/11/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: U.S. Security Associates Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Rolle William Dwayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670187AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:JORGE J GARCIA 2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2021 REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550339AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:JORGE J GARCIA 2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/12/2021 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jorge J Garcia