This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 09:56:57 (UTC).

TRADE LINK CAPITAL, INC. VS PANJABI FLORIDA, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 TRADE LINK CAPITAL, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against PANJABI FLORIDA, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trade Link Capital, Inc.

Defendants

Panjabi Florida, Inc.

Panjabi, Kirran

Israel Discount Bank of New York

Truist Bank

Apollo Bank

Panjabi, Ramesh

City National Bank of Florida

World Industries Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence J Shapiro

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/10/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/14/2022 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice of Appearance

06/21/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/22/2022 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Motion for Pro Hac Vice

06/22/2022 - Motion for Pro Hac Vice

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070081AMT PAID:$100.00NAME:LAWRENCE J SHAPIRO14 N.E. 1ST AVENUE, SUITE 1109MIAMI FL 33132COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3176-NON-FLA ATTORNEY F1$100.00$100.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$100.00RECEIPT DATE:06/24/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070216AMT PAID:$406.00NAME:LAWRENCE J SHAPIRO14 N.E. 1ST AVENUE, SUITE 1109MIAMI FL 33132COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$406.00RECEIPT DATE:06/14/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Israel Discount Bank of New York is a litigant

Latest cases where APOLLO BANK, a Florida State Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where City National Bank of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant