This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/19/2021 at 20:03:59 (UTC).

TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY VS CUESTA CONSTRUCTION CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CUESTA CONSTRUCTION CORP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignor

MCCARTY, KEVIN

Defendants

AB DEPENDABLE SERVICE INC

CHALEX COOL AIR OF MIAMI CORP

CUESTA CONSTRUCTION CORP

R+O STUDIO, LLC

JMM CONSULTING ENGINEERS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brooks C Rathet

Defendant Attorneys

Fernandez-Davila, Gerardo M., ESQ

Ronald E Kaufman

Jeffrey M Bell

Carlo Marichal, Esq.

Eldaher, Hitham N., ESQ

Peterson, Michael P.

Barri A Reisch

Bared, Paul R

Sweetbaum, Ari A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

10/01/2020 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/17/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/26/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

06/30/2020 - Service Returned

Request for Production

07/30/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Production

09/30/2020 - Request for Production

Motion to Dismiss

09/29/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Voluntary Dismissal

10/29/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/26/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Order to File

10/16/2021 - Order to File

Notice of Compliance

08/31/2021 - Notice of Compliance

Notice of Unavailability/absence

08/06/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Response:

07/29/2021 - Response:

Notice:

07/28/2021 - Notice:

Voluntary Dismissal

10/29/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

10/06/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Summary Judgment

07/26/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Mediation Conference

05/07/2021 - Notice of Mediation Conference

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to File; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO DEF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF ADOPTION OF CUESTA CONSTRUCTION CORP S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Mediation Conference; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AB DEPENDABLE SERVICE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670209AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BROOKS C RATHET 135 2ND AVE N STE 1 JACKSONVILLE BEACH FL 32250-69 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/26/2020 REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CUESTA CONSTRUCTION CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tower Hill Select Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rathet, Brooks Charles