This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:42:29 (UTC).

TOTAL LEAK DETECTION VS HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO INC

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 TOTAL LEAK DETECTION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY CASUALTY INS CO INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Total Leak Detection

Assignor

Menendez, Manuel

Defendant

Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Krzykwa, Mark C., ESQ

O'Hara, Jesse L

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey Allen Dethuin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/31/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

03/31/2022 - Statement of Claim

20 Day Summons Issued

04/08/2022 - 20 Day Summons Issued

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/19/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

05/19/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

05/19/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/19/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/24/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Change of Firm Name

05/25/2022 - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

06/03/2022 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Change of Firm Name; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060018AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/08/2022REGISTER#:206CASHIER:BELKISG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Homeowners Choice Property & Casualty Ins Co Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110144AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:O'HARA, JESSE LP.O BOX 16783PLANTATION FL 33318COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:04/01/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krzykwa, Mark Christopher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Hara, Jesse L