This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 03:34:54 (UTC).

TOTAL LEAK DETECTION (LLC) VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INS CO OF FLA

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 TOTAL LEAK DETECTION LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INS CO OF FLA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Total Leak Detection (LLC)

Assignor

Croker, Ricardo

Defendant

American Integrity Ins Co Of Fla

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

O'Hara, Jesse L

Krzykwa, Mark C., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/22/2022 - Statement of Claim

20 Day Summons Issued

05/11/2022 - 20 Day Summons Issued

Notice of Change of Firm Name

05/25/2022 - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

05/31/2022 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Notice of Compliance

06/20/2022 - Notice of Compliance

Notice of Interrogatory

06/21/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/21/2022 - Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

06/27/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Change of Firm Name; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650037AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/19/2022REGISTER#:265CASHIER:BELKISG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: American Integrity Ins Co Of Fla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070210AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:O'HARA, JESSE LP.O BOX 16783PLANTATION FL 33318COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2981.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krzykwa, Mark Christopher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Hara, Jesse L