This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/10/2023 at 18:24:37 (UTC).

TOTAL HEALTH CARE OF FLORIDA, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 TOTAL HEALTH CARE OF FLORIDA, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOTAL HEALTH CARE OF FLORIDA, INC.

Assignor

DIAZ, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey G. Hess

Defendant Attorney

Foman, William Randolph

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/08/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/08/2022 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/12/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/12/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/15/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

12/22/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

12/30/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

01/04/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

01/04/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

01/04/2023 - Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/16/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Admissions

01/16/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3151281AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C LLARENA5975 SUNSET DR STE 601SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5174COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/13/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130712AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:JOHN C LLARENA5975 SUNSET DR STE 601SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5174COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:12/10/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less