This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/25/2022 at 05:24:51 (UTC).

TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB WEST, LLC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB WEST, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab West, LLC

Assignor

Leon, Maria

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

01/14/2022 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/14/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Motion to Compel

10/19/2022 - Motion to Compel

AgreedOrder

10/12/2022 - AgreedOrder

AgreedOrder

10/12/2022 - AgreedOrder

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

10/10/2022 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

10/10/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Witness List

09/23/2022 - Witness List

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

08/04/2022 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Motion to Compel

06/24/2022 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Hearing-

06/09/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Compel

06/03/2022 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Hearing-

06/01/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

06/01/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Order:

05/20/2022 - Order:

Motion to Compel

05/09/2022 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/28/2022 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion:

04/05/2022 - Motion:

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS BETTER ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS BETTER ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE 20 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE ITS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEF'S. MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT IS GRANTED. SEE ORDER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Amend Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Amend; Event Type: Event; Comments: BY INTERLINEATION AND THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030202AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040149AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/15/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less